Global Patent Index - EP 0950609 A3

EP 0950609 A3 2000-05-03 - Apparatus for the treatment of containers

Title (en)

Apparatus for the treatment of containers

Title (de)

Maschine zum Behandeln von Gefässen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le traitement des conteneurs

Publication

EP 0950609 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106067 A

Priority

DE 29806838 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950609A2] A heat-shield (12), in the form of a blower, between the heat source (9), in the form of a hot-air fan, and the containers (1) interrupts the heat-transmission onto the fittings (20) and the containers. The blower produces an air curtain (22) between the containers and the hot-air fan. The machine has a conveyor (8) along which the blower runs on one side and parallel with it. The tubular blower has openings (21) or nozzles in and is switched on or off by a control and control valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 3/26; B65C 3/06; B65C 9/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/06 (2006.01); B65C 3/08 (2006.01); B65C 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/26 (2013.01); B65C 3/065 (2013.01); B65C 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806838 U1 19980618; EP 0950609 A2 19991020; EP 0950609 A3 20000503; EP 0950609 B1 20040602; US 6098381 A 20000808; ZA 9902643 B 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150326

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909628

2014-10-29 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20140620

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2006-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: B&H MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

2005-04-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: B&H MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

- Effective date: 20050225

2005-04-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: B&H MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

- Effective date: 20050225

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909628 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000325

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65C 3/26 A, 7B 65C 9/24 B, 7B 65C 3/06 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI