Global Patent Index - EP 0950641 A3

EP 0950641 A3 2000-04-12 - Tablets and method for preventing or diminishing formation of deposits in water collection systems for construction works

Title (en)

Tablets and method for preventing or diminishing formation of deposits in water collection systems for construction works

Title (de)

Depotsteine und Verfahren zur Verhinderung bzw. Verminderung der Bildung von Ablagerungen in Bauwerksentwässerungssystemen

Title (fr)

Tablettes et méthode pour la prévention ou la diminution de la formation de dépôts dans les systèmes d'évacuation des eaux des ouvrages de construction

Publication

EP 0950641 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105768 A

Priority

CH 86498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH689452A5] Method (I) of inhibiting deposits of cement in drainage systems for buildings, is new. (I) comprises adding conditioner to the percolating or ground water to be drained off

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01); E02D 31/02 (2006.01); E21F 16/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/008 (2013.01); E02D 31/02 (2013.01); E21F 16/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CH 689452 A5 19990430; CH 689452 C1 20041130; DE 29905245 U1 19990617; EP 0950641 A2 19991020; EP 0950641 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI