EP 0950722 A1 19991020 - Blast furnace cooling
Title (en)
Blast furnace cooling
Title (de)
Kühlung eines Hochofens
Title (fr)
Refroidissement d'un haut fourneau
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19816867 A 19980416
Abstract (en)
The water-cooled cooling elements between the furnace lining (7) and the surrounding metal casing (8) within the hearth region (5) of the blast furnace (1) are made of a highly heat conductive material such as copper, for example, with a heat conductivity equal to at least five times the heat conductivity of cast iron.
Abstract (de)
Um die Gefahr von Durchbrüchen im Gestellbereich (5) beim Betrieb eines Hochofens (1) zu minimieren, wird gemäß der Erfindung vorgeschlagen, wassergekühlte Kühlelemente (13), die zwischen der feuerfesten Gestellausmauerung (7) und der sie umgebenden Gestellpanzerung (8) angeordnet sind, aus einem hoch wärmeleitfähigen Material zu fertigen, dessen Wärmeleitfähigkeit mindestens fünfmal größer ist als die von Gusseisen, beispielsweise Kupfer. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP US)
C21B 7/10 (2013.01 - EP US); C21B 7/106 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 3849587 A 19741119 - HATCH G, et al
- [XP] WO 9832883 A1 19980730 - HOOGOVENS STAAL BV [NL], et al
- [A] DE 1956837 A1 19710527 - DEMAG AG
- [A] US 2333439 A 19431102 - PETERS JAMES F
- [A] FR 2164218 A5 19730727 - HOOGOVENS IJMUIDEN BV
- [A] US 4061317 A 19771206 - ANDONIEV SERGEI MIKHAILOVICH, et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 97, no. 10 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
- [Y] HILLE H: "THE COPPER STAVE - A MAJOR FACTOR IN PROLONGING THE SERVICE LIFE OFTHE BLAST FURNACE", MAN RESEARCH ENGINEERING MANUFACTURING, 1 January 1997 (1997-01-01), pages 72 - 79, XP000755403, ISSN: UNKNOWN
- [Y] GÖTZ FUNKE: "KÜHLUNG EINES HOCHOFENS MIT KUPFERKÜHLPLATTEN", STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 100, no. 23, 17 November 1980 (1980-11-17), DÜSSELDORF,DE, pages 1395 - 1399, XP002110815
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 004 31 May 1995 (1995-05-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 485 (C - 1248) 9 September 1994 (1994-09-09)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0950722 A1 19991020; DE 19816867 A1 19991021; JP H11323414 A 19991126; US 2003020212 A1 20030130; ZA 992427 B 19990723
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99107137 A 19990413; DE 19816867 A 19980416; JP 10848499 A 19990415; US 24507302 A 20020917; ZA 992427 A 19990330