Global patent index - EP 0950732 A3

EP 0950732 A3 2000-01-05 - Method and apparatus for the production of polyester yarns

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the production of polyester yarns

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Polyestergarnen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production de fils de polyester

Publication

EP 0950732 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106352 A

Priority

DE 19816979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950732A2] The production process for melt-spun polyester filaments (8) has a preliminary drawing action through a counter flow at a temp. of 100-199 degrees C and preferably 120-170 degrees C to develop a crystallinity of 24%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/62; D01D 5/16; D01D 10/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/12 (2006.01); D01D 5/04 (2006.01); D01D 5/16 (2006.01); D01D 10/02 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D02J 1/22 (2006.01); D02J 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/16 (2013.01); D01D 10/02 (2013.01); D01F 6/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950732 A2 19991020; EP 0950732 A3 20000105; EP 0950732 B1 20030226; CN 1105197 C 20030409; CN 1232889 A 19991027; CZ 293617 B6 20040616; CZ 9802680 A3 19991215; DE 19816979 A1 19991021; ES 2189303 T3 20030701; PL 192400 B1 20061031; PL 328988 A1 19991025; SK 284978 B6 20060302; SK 49099 A3 20010710; TW 475011 B 20020201; US 6149847 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UHDE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 09

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-03-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2189303

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59904352

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030403

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: UHDE GMBH

2002-09-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF POLYESTER YARNS

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRUPP UHDE GMBH

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI