Global Patent Index - EP 0950746 B1

EP 0950746 B1 2000-03-22 - Device for tensioning a fabric placed around the fabric shafts in an embroidering machine

Title (en)

Device for tensioning a fabric placed around the fabric shafts in an embroidering machine

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung zum Spannen einer um die Stoffwellen einer Stickmaschine gelegten Stoffbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tendre le tissu placé sur les rouleaux dans une machine à broder

Publication

EP 0950746 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98100199 A

Priority

EP 98100199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950746A1] The fabric is stretched between rollers rotated in opposite directions by sprockets (25). Chains (27) with a smooth section (28') and a drive section (28) run from an actuator (29) over the sprockets (25) to springs (63). The fabric is tensioned when the drive section of the chain is on the sprocket but the rollers are free to rotate when the smooth section reaches the sprocket. The actuator (29') can be a manual rack (57) and pinion with a ratchet (61) and ratchet wheel or alternatively a pneumatically driven screwed spindle. The drive for moving the fabric forward on the rollers is connected through a pneumatic clutch.

Abstract (de)

Eine Spannvorrichtung zum Spannen des Stickgrundes zwischen den Stoffwellen eines Stickmaschinengatters weist ein Kettenrad (25) auf, über welches eine Kette (27) geführt ist. Wird zum Spannen an der Kette (27) gezogen, so greift die Kette mit einer Triplex-Ketten-Partie (28) in zwei Zahnkränze ein, wodurch die Stoffwellen durch weiteres Verkürzen der Kette gedreht werden können. Wird die Kette jedoch verlängert, zieht eine Feder (63) die Kette (27) zurück. Dadurch gerät die Triplex-Ketten-Partie (28) ausser Eingriff mit dem Kettenrad (25). In einem mittleren Bereich des Kettenrades (25) mit einer Gleitfläche für die Zugkette (28') kann diese über das Kettenrad (25) gleiten, ohne ein Drehmoment übertragen zu können. Daher kann bei einer solchen Stellung der Kette (27) über die gleiche Welle die Stoffwelle gedreht und der Stoff auf- oder abgewickelt werden, über welche der Stoff auch gespannt wird, ohne dass sich Spann- und Wickelfunktion gegenseitig behindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 9/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950746 A1 19991020; EP 0950746 B1 20000322; AT 191022 T 20000415; DE 59800107 D1 20000427; TR 9900022 A2 19990721; TR 9900022 A3 19990721

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800107

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191022 T

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-08-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800107

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070108

2009-08-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG;ELESTASTRASSE 8;7310 BAD RAGAZ (CH)

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800107 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191022 T 20000415

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI