Global Patent Index - EP 0950753 A3

EP 0950753 A3 2000-08-02 - Planetary stranding machine with a drive for the supply reels

Title (en)

Planetary stranding machine with a drive for the supply reels

Title (de)

Korbverseilmaschine mit einem Antrieb für Ablaufspulen

Title (fr)

Toronneuse planétaire avec un dispositif d'entraînement de bobines débitrices

Publication

EP 0950753 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106976 A

Priority

DE 19816620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950753A2] The supply bobbins (12) are held in rotating bobbin carriers (8) that are in turn held on rotating end plates (3a,b,c). The bobbins are positively driven by motors (15) mounted on one of the end plates to control the strand tension. The drive is taken through one of the hollow stub shafts (9a,b) and transmitted to the bobbin through a right angle belt and gearbox drive (16,17,18,19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D07B 3/06; D07B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D07B 3/06 (2006.01); D07B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 3/06 (2013.01); D07B 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0116174 A2 19840822 - SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950753 A2 19991020; EP 0950753 A3 20000802; DE 19816620 C1 19991209

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-05-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-02-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOLBERGER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG.

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR IT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI