Global patent index - EP 0950755 A3

EP 0950755 A3 2000-11-29 - Press roll and pressing arrangement using such a roll

Title (en)

Press roll and pressing arrangement using such a roll

Title (de)

Presswalze sowie Pressenanordnung mit wenigstens einer solchen Presswalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau de pressage et dispositif de pressage utilisant un tel rouleau

Publication

EP 0950755 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104540 A

Priority

DE 19816673 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6406596B1] Press roll, system and method for the treatment of a fibrous material web. The press roll forms at least one nip with a respective mating surface and comprises a non-rotatably mounted carrier, a press sleeve surrounding the carrier, and at least one outer support device disposed between the carrier and the press sleeve, the press sleeve being supported against the carrier at a respective press nip. The press roll additionally comprises a sagging control system to control the sagging of the carrier. The system additionally provides first and second mating rolls that form respective first and second nips with the press roll. A method of treating a material web comprises guiding the web along a felt through the press roll and mating rolls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/0245 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6406596 B1 20020618; DE 19816673 A1 19991021; EP 0950755 A2 19991020; EP 0950755 A3 20001129; EP 1361307 A1 20031112

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040616

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030213

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI