Global Patent Index - EP 0950756 A3

EP 0950756 A3 2001-02-07 - Press nip

Title (en)

Press nip

Title (de)

Pressspalt

Title (fr)

Interstice de pressage

Publication

EP 0950756 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105591 A

Priority

DE 19817300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950756A2] At the press rollers (2,3) to extract water from a wet fiber web, a channel (5) is formed in the peripheral direction of the upper roller (2) between it and the gutter (4) which catches and removes water sprayed from the upper roller (2). The air flow is strengthened in the peripheral direction of the channel (5). A suction unit (7) is at the catch zone (6) of the gutter (4), acting at least partially on the channel (5). Air is blown in at least at the end zone of the channel (5), in the peripheral direction of the roller (2). Air is blown in towards the outlet gap between the upper roller (2) and the web (1). The additional vol. (V) of the air feed is set according to the web movement speed (v) where V=v.d where d is the mean gap between the upper roller (2) and the gutter (4) at the channel (5). A press blanket (9) travels between the upper roller (2) and the web (1), with the gutter (4) at the outlet gap between them. The upper roller (2) has a profiled mantle surface, pref. drilled and/or ridged. The gutter (4) has a deflector bar at the start of the channel (5), against the press blanket (9), to direct the water into the channel (5). The gutter (4) is sealed against the upper roller (2) at the roller ends and/or after the end of the channel (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2013.01); D21F 3/0272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950756 A2 19991020; EP 0950756 A3 20010207; DE 19817300 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI