Global patent index - EP 0950778 A3

EP 0950778 A3 2000-01-05 - A tile applicator

Title (en)

A tile applicator

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Fliesen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour appliquer des carreaux

Publication

EP 0950778 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99650035 A

Priority

IE 980280 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950778A2] A tile applicator (1) is a hand tool provided for the tiling of walls, ceilings or floors which is a support having end walls (2, 3) and side walls (4, 5) forming comers (7) in turn supporting a spacer means (10) formed from a spacer plates (11, 12) which effectively act as a jig to engage between tiles already in situ to orient a tile (30) correctly with respect to them. In the applicator (1) illustrated the spacer plates (11, 12) also act as means for releasably securing the tile (30) within the applicator (1). The spacer means (10) may be made such that it is movable to and from a position adjacent the comer (7) to accommodate different sizes of tile (30). In use the tile applicator (1) is offered up to a tile (30) picks it up is then positioned to engage existing tiles with the spacer means and removed leaving the tile (30) in position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/18; E04F 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/18 (2006.01); E04F 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/22 (2013.01); E04F 21/1844 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950778 A2 19991020; EP 0950778 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011101

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI