Global Patent Index - EP 0950793 A3

EP 0950793 A3 2000-09-13 - Hydraulic operated impact drilling device

Title (en)

Hydraulic operated impact drilling device

Title (de)

Hydraulisch betriebene Schlagdrehbohrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de forage tournant et frappant, actionné hydrauliquement

Publication

EP 0950793 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104661 A

Priority

DE 19817144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817144C1] A releasable joint, for connecting a drill string section with a drive shaft, comprises a screw connection (4) secured by a mechanical coupling formed by separable flanges including an internal thread (7) running counter to the screw connection thread. A releasable joint, for connecting the first section of the drill string of rotary percussive drilling equipment with the output shaft of the drive (rotary drive or drill hammer), comprises a screw connection secured by a mechanical coupling. The novelty is that (a) the mechanical coupling is formed by two separable flanges, i.e. an output shaft flange (5) enclosing a section (1') of the drive output shaft (1) and a drill string flange (6) enclosing an adjacent section (3) of the drill string; (b) axially extending transmission elements (8) are provided between the inside of one of the flanges (5, 6) and the associated enclosed section (1', 3), the other flange having an internal thread (7) running counter to the thread of the screw connection (4); and (c) the drive output shaft section (1') or the adjacent drill string section (3), adjoining the screw connection (4), is provided with a thread corresponding to the thread (7) on the output shaft flange (5) or the drill string flange (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/02; B25D 17/08; E21B 17/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 1167288 B 19640409 - KORFMANN GMBH MASCHF

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817144 C1 19990909; EP 0950793 A2 19991020; EP 0950793 A3 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011116

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 17/02 A, 7E 21B 17/03 B, 7B 25D 17/08 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI