Global Patent Index - EP 0950849 A3

EP 0950849 A3 2001-04-18 - Luminaire for tubular discharge lamps, in particular of the dust- and water-tight type

Title (en)

Luminaire for tubular discharge lamps, in particular of the dust- and water-tight type

Title (de)

Leuchte für langgestreckte Leuchtstofflampen, insbesondere in staub- und wasserdichter Ausführung

Title (fr)

Luminaire pour tubes fluorescents, en particulier du type imperméable à la poussière et à l'eau

Publication

EP 0950849 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105707 A

Priority

DE 29806792 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950849A2] The lamp has a base body to protect the switch unit, starter, etc. Casings close the endfaces of the base body. Between them is a tubular lamp cover with endface apertures for the fluorescent tube. The base body is formed from two parallel hollow strips with a web between them. The casings have two holders for the fluorescent tubes, and there are corresponding apertures (14,15) in the endfaces of the lamp cover (11), opposite each other. There may be oval or rhombic collars (13) at the endfaces of the lamp cover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 3/00; F21V 15/00; F21V 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 19/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806792 U1 19980625; EP 0950849 A2 19991020; EP 0950849 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI