Global Patent Index - EP 0950852 B1

EP 0950852 B1 2002-11-27 - Luminaire for tubular discharge lamps

Title (en)

Luminaire for tubular discharge lamps

Title (de)

Leuchte für langgestreckte Leuchtstofflampen

Title (fr)

Luminaire pour tubes fluorescents

Publication

EP 0950852 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105708 A

Priority

DE 29806793 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950852A2] The fluorescent tube lamp has a tubular lamp cover (2) with headpieces (3) which have apertures (6) for the tube and a base (1) with a casing (4) to which the lamp cover is fitted and from which it can be released. There are connecting elements between the headpieces of the lamp cover and the base body or the casing, which carry the released lamp cover, and are arranged so that when the lamp cover is fixed back in place, they revert to their initial or rest position. They are attached to the headpieces and/or the body or casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806793 U1 19980625; AT 228627 T 20021215; EP 0950852 A2 19991020; EP 0950852 A3 20010425; EP 0950852 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: NORKA NORDDEUTSCHE KUNSTSTOFF- UND ELEKTRO-G.- *ST

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903506 20030109

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL SE

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228627 T 20021215

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI