Global patent index - EP 0950854 A3

EP 0950854 A3 2000-03-01 - Combustion device

Title (en)

Combustion device

Title (de)

Verbrennungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de combustion

Publication

EP 0950854 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302774 A

Priority

  • JP 9897698 A
  • JP 8539799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950854A2] A combustion device has a ceramic burner (3) comprising a porous ceramic plate having a plurality of burner ports (32) defined therein, an electrically conductive layer (7) disposed on a surface of the ceramic burner where flames are produced, an electric conductor (8) disposed in facing relation to the electrically conductive layer, and an ignition detector (9) for detecting a flame current flowing through the flames (F) to detect an ignition when a voltage is applied between the electrically conductive layer and the electric conductor. The electrically conductive layer is made of an electrically conductive perovskite-type metal oxide. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/72; F23N 5/12; F23Q 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/12 (2006.01); F23D 14/14 (2006.01); F23D 14/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/725 (2013.01); F23D 2203/102 (2013.01); F23D 2203/105 (2013.01); F23D 2212/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2220059 A 19891228 - RINNAI KK [JP]
  • [A] US 4449919 A 19840522 - TAKIKAWA OSAMU [JP], et al
  • [A] US 4337028 A 19820629 - ANGWIN MEREDITH J, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 342 (P - 908) 2 August 1989 (1989-08-02)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 201 (M - 163) 13 October 1982 (1982-10-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 081 (M - 1086) 25 February 1991 (1991-02-25)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950854 A2 19991020; EP 0950854 A3 20000301; EP 0950854 B1 20030702; DE 69909167 D1 20030807; DE 69909167 T2 20040108; ES 2201634 T3 20040316; JP H11351521 A 19991224; KR 100594677 B1 20060628; KR 19990083117 A 19991125

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69909167

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2201634

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909167

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SOBUE, TSUTOMU,C/O RINNAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OHASHI, RYUSEI,C/O RINNAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-05-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YANO, KOJI,C/O RINNAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 23D 14/72 A, 7F 23Q 9/00 B, 7F 23N 5/12 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI