Global Patent Index - EP 0950857 B1

EP 0950857 B1 2003-06-04 - Mechanical fumes aspirator with lateral release

Title (en)

Mechanical fumes aspirator with lateral release

Title (de)

Seitlich verschwenkbarer mechanischer Rauchabsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur mécanique de fumées escamotable par dégagement latéral

Publication

EP 0950857 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400915 A

Priority

FR 9804870 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0950857A1] The smoke extractor (1) consists of a rotary turbine (3) connected to the free end (4a) of a driven vertical spindle which has its lower end rotating in a bearing on a support with radial arms. The turbine, spindle, bearing and support form a movable assembly (11) which can be swung to one side of the chimney (2) by a pivot (12) on an adapter ring (9) to give access for maintenance and repair.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/10; F24F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/10 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 7/02 (2013.01); F23L 17/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0950857 A1 19991020; EP 0950857 B1 20030604; DE 69908481 D1 20030710; DE 69908481 T2 20031218; ES 2197585 T3 20040101; FR 2777633 A1 19991022; FR 2777633 B1 20000630; PT 950857 E 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160415

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161014

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160414

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160414

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160414

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908481

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197585 T3

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908481 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETABLISSEMENTS POUJOULAT

2000-08-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT

2000-07-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000420

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI