Global Patent Index - EP 0950933 A4

EP 0950933 A4 2000-04-05 - ANALOG ELECTRONIC CLOCK

Title (en)

ANALOG ELECTRONIC CLOCK

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHE ANALOGUHR

Title (fr)

MONTRE ELECTRONIQUE ANALOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0950933 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98900177 A

Priority

  • JP 9800033 W
  • JP 141697 A
  • JP 256997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830939A1] A weight (20) is added, to lessen moment as the whole rotary body, at least to a part of the rotary body including a hand (8) and train wheels (11, 2, 12, 3) for the rotation of the hand, in order to make a disturbance energy which a step motor (1) receives by an external impact, less than a small holding energy which the step motor (1) used in an analog electronic clock retains, or a thin part, a through hole, or a notch is formed at least in a part of said rotary body, or a part of the rotary members is formed by the combination of members with different specific gravities from each other. Transmission of the disturbance energy occurring at the hand part to the step motor (1) is prevented by providing a reverse transmission preventing gear at a part of said train wheels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 3/14; G04B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/02 (2006.01); G04B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/02 (2013.01); G04B 19/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830939 A1 19980716; CN 1243579 A 20000202; EP 0950933 A1 19991020; EP 0950933 A4 20000405; JP 3245181 B2 20020107

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.

2000-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990802

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI