Global patent index - EP 0951000 A3

EP 0951000 A3 2000-06-21 - Device for deactivating a security element for the electronic protection of articles

Title (en)

Device for deactivating a security element for the electronic protection of articles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Deaktivieren eines Sicherungselementes für die elektronische Artikelsicherung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour désactiver un élément de sécurité pour la protection électronique d'articles

Publication

EP 0951000 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123424 A

Priority

  • DE 19816958 A
  • DE 19831415 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951000A2] A reversing device (4) for a magnet's (2) field lines is fitted between a security tag to be deactivated and the magnet. A slot (5) is provided in the reversing device for focussing the magnet's field lines. The security tag is made from magnetic material of both high and low permeability and high and low coercive force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951000 A2 19991020; EP 0951000 A3 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040210

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020715

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI