Global Patent Index - EP 0951029 A3

EP 0951029 A3 2000-06-07 - Arcing contact arrangement

Title (en)

Arcing contact arrangement

Title (de)

Abbrandschaltanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de contacts d'arc

Publication

EP 0951029 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810169 A

Priority

DE 19816507 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951029A2] The switching arrangement comprises a first switching part (4) which is connected, at least in an on position, with a first electric connection, and a second switching part (6) which is connected, at least in the on position, with a second electric connection. The second switching part includes a switching pin (5) mounted at a fixture, which is moved by means of a switching drive along a switching axis (1) relative to the first switching part. The switching arrangement comprises a first switching part (4) which is connected, at least in an on position, with a first electric connection, and a second switching part (6) which is connected, at least in the on position, with a second electric connection. The second switching part includes a switching pin (5) mounted at a fixture. The switching pin is moved by means of a switching drive along a switching axis (1) relative to the first switching part, between the on position, in which the switching pin touches the first switching part, so that the switching arrangement closes a current path between the first connection and the second connection, and an off position, in which the switching pin is separated from the first switching part. The first switching piece is formed rigidly, and the switching pin is formed or held in such way, that it presses in the on position with a first contact zone against the first switching part, under the influence of mechanical or electromagnetic contact forces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/38; H01H 1/46; H01H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 1/38 (2006.01); H01H 1/46 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/985 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/385 (2013.01); H01H 1/46 (2013.01); H01H 33/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951029 A2 19991020; EP 0951029 A3 20000607; EP 0951029 B1 20060301; CN 1183570 C 20050105; CN 1234593 A 19991110; DE 19816507 A1 19991021; DE 59913176 D1 20060427; JP 4365473 B2 20091118; JP H11329175 A 19991130; US 6100489 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913176 P 20060427

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZEHNDER, LUKAS, DR.

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERES, ROBERT

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAEHLER, CHRISTIAN

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALTENEGGER, KURT, DR.

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHOENEMANN, THOMAS, DR.

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WELTMANN, KLAUS-DIETER, DR.

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ AG

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB HOCHSPANNUNGSTECHNIK AG

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI