Global Patent Index - EP 0951032 A3

EP 0951032 A3 2000-10-04 - Snap disc switch having improved contact distance

Title (en)

Snap disc switch having improved contact distance

Title (de)

Schnappscheibenschalter mit vergrössertem Kontaktweg

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à disque cloquant avec une distance de contact améliorée

Publication

EP 0951032 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106920 A

Priority

DE 19816956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951032A2] The switch has a separating element (8) by which at least one of the locating elements (3,4,5,6) is moved a distance away from the base element (5). The separating element is preferably a leaf spring coming from one of the locating elements. It may have a foot for fastening it into an opening. The switch is preferably formed in one piece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/50; H01H 13/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19816956 C1 19991007; EP 0951032 A2 19991020; EP 0951032 A3 20001004; EP 0951032 B1 20040908; ES 2224480 T3 20050301

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140409

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140408

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20121010

2012-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2012-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-02-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-04-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224480

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-09-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01H 3/50 A, 7H 01H 13/48 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI