Global Patent Index - EP 0951037 A3

EP 0951037 A3 2000-05-10 - Limit switch mechanism for mechanical actuating switch contacts

Title (en)

Limit switch mechanism for mechanical actuating switch contacts

Title (de)

Endschaltergetriebe zur mechanischen Betätigung von Schaltkontakten

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'interrupteur de fin de course pour la commande mécanique de contacts d 'interrupteur

Publication

EP 0951037 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103999 A

Priority

DE 29806920 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951037A2] The end switch operating drive is used for mechanical operation of the switch contacts, with at least one cogwheel (5,6,15) fitted to at least one drive shaft (3,7). The latter has a polygonal cross-section throughout its length, the cogwheel provided with a central opening with the corresponding polygonal profile. The drive shaft may be provided by a length of continuously drawn or extruded profile, its polygonal cross-section having a number of relatively spaced cylindrical outer contour sections and intermediate longitudinal channel sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/18; H01H 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/18 (2006.01); H01H 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/18 (2013.01); H01H 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806920 U1 19980702; EP 0951037 A2 19991020; EP 0951037 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001111

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI