Global Patent Index - EP 0951040 A3

EP 0951040 A3 2000-07-26 - Thermally actuated switch

Title (en)

Thermally actuated switch

Title (de)

Temperaturabhängiger Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à commande thermique

Publication

EP 0951040 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100553 A

Priority

DE 19816807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951040A2] A resistive section (19), preferably a positive temperature coefficient (PTC) block is mounted externally on the insulative support (11) and held by it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54; H01H 1/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/504 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951040 A2 19991020; EP 0951040 A3 20000726; EP 0951040 B1 20080730; EP 0951040 B2 20170315; AT 403229 T 20080815; AU 2377099 A 19991028; AU 745179 B2 20020314; DE 19816807 A1 19991028; DE 19816807 C2 20000608; DE 59914816 D1 20080911; ES 2311299 T3 20090201; US 6133817 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20170315

2017-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914816

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150114

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 403229 T

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130113

2013-08-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-08-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120702

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

- Free text: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH#IM ALTGEFAELL 8#75181 PFORZHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH#SALZSTRASSE 11#99706 SONDERSHAUSEN (DE)

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH, 75181 PFORZHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59914816

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914816

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THERMIK GERAETEBAU GMBH

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-08-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TMC SENSORTECHNIK GMBH

2009-06-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TMC SENSORTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20090428

2009-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2311299 T3

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081230

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914816 P 20080911

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P.

2008-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECHER, MICHAEL

2008-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUETTINGER, EDWIN

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P.

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECHER, MICHAEL

2007-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUETTINGER, EDWIN

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P.

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BECHER, MICHAEL

2007-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUETTINGER, EDWIN

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI