Global Patent Index - EP 0951045 A3

EP 0951045 A3 2000-07-12 - Ground fault circuit braker

Title (en)

Ground fault circuit braker

Title (de)

Fehlerstromschutzschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur à courant de défaut

Publication

EP 0951045 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106744 A

Priority

  • DE 19816459 A
  • DE 19912416 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951045A2] The switch includes an electromagnetic error current release (25) which comprises a pestle (26), whose movement is transferred to a locking point (16, 18) of a switching lock, suitable for a conductor protection switch. A further locking point (30, 36) is arranged between the pestle and the first locking point, through which a spring-loaded trigger element (28) is activated to release the first locking point. The switch includes an electromagnetic error current release (25) which comprises a pestle (26), whose movement is transferred to a locking point (16, 18) of a switching lock, suitable for a conductor protection switch. A further locking point (30, 36) is arranged between the pestle and the first locking point, through which a spring-loaded trigger element (28) is activated to release the first locking point, so that the switching lock suitable for a conductor protection switch can be used in the error current protection switch. The release and an auxiliary control mechanism with the further locking point are fastened to a common carrier (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 83/02; H01H 83/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 83/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951045 A2 19991020; EP 0951045 A3 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060530

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

2001-03-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990414

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990414

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 83/02 A, 7H 01H 83/20 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT PT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990414