Global Patent Index - EP 0951092 A3

EP 0951092 A3 2000-11-02 - Electrical connector for coaxial cables

Title (en)

Electrical connector for coaxial cables

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder für Koaxialkabel

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique pour des câbles coaxiaux

Publication

EP 0951092 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107057 A

Priority

JP 12399198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951092A2] An electrical connector is provided for terminating a plurality of coaxial cables in a generally parallel planar array. A dielectric housing defines a cable insertion side and a termination side. A ground bar is provided on the housing at the cable insertion side thereof for engaging the conductive shields of the cables. A press bar is provided on the housing at the cable insertion side thereof for biasing the conductive shields of the cables into engagement with the ground bar. A plurality of insulation displacement terminals are mounted on the housing at the termination side thereof for engaging the inner conductors of the coaxial cables. A termination bar is provided on the housing at the termination side thereof operatively associated with the terminals to facilitate terminating the terminals with the conductors of the coaxial cables. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01); H01R 13/648 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/242 (2013.01); H01R 9/0512 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951092 A2 19991020; EP 0951092 A3 20001102; JP H11307187 A 19991105

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI