Global Patent Index - EP 0951094 B1

EP 0951094 B1 2003-06-11 - Connection arrangement with insulation displacement connector

Title (en)

Connection arrangement with insulation displacement connector

Title (de)

Anschlusskontaktvorrichtung mit Schneidklemmverbinder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion autodénudant

Publication

EP 0951094 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420087 A

Priority

FR 9805053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951094A1] The stripping part is made in a single section. The strip section forms an entrance part with protruding section through which the cable passes and the outer sleeve is stripped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2416 (2013.01); H01R 4/4845 (2013.01); H01R 4/4827 (2013.01); H01R 9/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951094 A1 19991020; EP 0951094 B1 20030611; DE 69908700 D1 20030717; DE 69908700 T2 20040115; ES 2204087 T3 20040416; FR 2777702 A1 19991022; FR 2777702 B1 20000616; US 6146186 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908700

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908700

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100403

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100402

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204087 T3

2004-04-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-04-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-03-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908700 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-06-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI