Global Patent Index - EP 0951103 A3

EP 0951103 A3 2000-11-15 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0951103 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107590 A

Priority

JP 12294898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951103A2] An electric connector 10 includes a body 12 having a plurality of horizontally extending signal terminals 13c, the signal terminals being projected, as connection terminals, from a side surface of the body, the body being mounted with the side surface opposed to a sub-board 11 and with a bottom surface thereof opposed to a main board 18, wherein in order to connect wiring patterns formed on the sub-board to corresponding wiring patterns formed on the main board, the body is provided with a plurality of L-shaped-connection pins 15 projected from the side and bottom surfaces of the body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/70; H01R 9/09; H05K 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/00 (2006.01); H05K 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/52 (2013.01); H01R 2201/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951103 A2 19991020; EP 0951103 A3 20001115; EP 0951103 B1 20021023; DE 69903590 D1 20021128; DE 69903590 T2 20030306; JP H11307204 A 19991105

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903590 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/04 A, 7H 01R 12/18 B, 7H 01R 12/20 B, 7H 01R 12/32 B, 7H 05K 3/36 B

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 23/70 A, 7H 01R 9/09 B, 7H 05K 3/36 B

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI