Global patent index - EP 0951106 A3

EP 0951106 A3 2000-06-14 - Multiple socket connector with adjustable mounting bracket

Title (en)

Multiple socket connector with adjustable mounting bracket

Title (de)

Mehrfachsteckdose mit verstellbarem Montagewinkel

Title (fr)

Connecteur à prises multiples avec support de montage ajustable

Publication

EP 0951106 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107594 A

Priority

DE 19817307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951106A2] Each mounting bracket (8) made of angle section, can be fixed to the plug board (1) casing (2), in one of several angular positions around its longitudinal axis (L).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 25/00; H01R 13/73

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/73 (2006.01); H01R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/73 (2013.01); H01R 25/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951106 A2 19991020; EP 0951106 A3 20000614; EP 0951106 B1 20041110; AT 282252 T 20041115; DE 19817307 A1 19991028; DE 19817307 C2 20001123

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *POPP G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: POPP GMBH + CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-11-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *POPP G.M.B.H. + CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2005-04-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050416

2005-03-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911025

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR LI NL SE

2004-11-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041110

2004-07-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POPP GMBH + CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ECKSTEIN, STEFAN

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FI FR LI NL SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR LI NL SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI