Global Patent Index - EP 0951108 A3

EP 0951108 A3 2001-01-24 - Socket for fluorescent lamps, in particular for annular fluorescent lamps

Title (en)

Socket for fluorescent lamps, in particular for annular fluorescent lamps

Title (de)

Fassung für Leuchtstofflampen, insbesondere für Ringlampen

Title (fr)

Douille pour lampes fluorescentes, particulièrement pour lampes fluorescentes annulaires

Publication

EP 0951108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106789 A

Priority

DE 19817074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951108A2] The socket fitting (10) has an insulating socket fitting body (11) provided on one side with a reception channel (14) for the fluorescent lamp socket, with adjacent contact chambers (19) receiving the lamp contact pins, inserted transverse to their longitudinal direction. At least one hinged flap (21) is attached to the socket fitting body and moved between an open position for insertion of the fluorescent lamp socket and a closed position in which the pin contacts are covered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/08 (2006.01); H01R 33/965 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/0809 (2013.01); H01R 33/965 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951108 A2 19991020; EP 0951108 A3 20010124; EP 0951108 B1 20051109; AT 309631 T 20051115; DE 19817074 C1 19991021; ES 2251802 T3 20060501

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140406

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130407

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130406

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130406

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-12-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251802 T3

2006-04-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-04-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060406

2006-02-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-08-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BJB GMBH & CO. KG

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI