Global Patent Index - EP 0951189 A3

EP 0951189 A3 2000-04-19 - Dual band portable phone switchable between different phone systems

Title (en)

Dual band portable phone switchable between different phone systems

Title (de)

Dualband tragbares Telefon, umschaltbar zwischen unterschiedlichen Telefonsystemen

Title (fr)

Téléphone portable à double bande commutable entre deux systèmes de téléphonie

Publication

EP 0951189 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99106195 A

Priority

JP 10099398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951189A2] A dual band portable phone includes a first mobile phone system (2) used in a first mode, a second mobile phone system (3) used in a second mode, a storing section (5) and a control section (4). The storing section (5) has a mode area for storing a mode data indicative of a current operation mode, a first area for storing a first control channel data indicative of a first control channel used for the first mobile phone system in the first mode, and a second area for storing a second control channel data indicative of a second control channel used for the second mobile phone system in the second mode. The mode data indicates the first mode at present. The control section (4) performs a position registration of the portable phone using the second control channel data stored in the storing section to set the second mode, when a first radio communication using the first mobile phone system becomes impossible while the first radio communication is performed in the first mode. The control section (4) also performs a second radio communication using the second mobile phone system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/06 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 88/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951189 A2 19991020; EP 0951189 A3 20000419; EP 0951189 B1 20080702; AU 2370499 A 19991021; AU 759371 B2 20030410; CN 1115806 C 20030723; CN 1237048 A 19991201; DE 69938987 D1 20080814; JP 3048137 B2 20000605; JP H11298964 A 19991029; US 6453172 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170404

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150409

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-03-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69938987

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

2014-10-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: APPLE INC., US

- Effective date: 20140924

2014-10-02 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69938987

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04Q0007320000

- IPC: H04W0088060000

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-10-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APPLE INC., CUPERTINO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NEC CORP., TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69938987

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-10-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69938987

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-10-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69938987

- Representative's name: BARDEHLE PAGENBERG PARTNERSCHAFT MBB PATENTANW, DE

- Effective date: 20140821

2014-09-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140814 AND 20140820

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-21 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69938987

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04Q0007320000

- IPC: H04W0088060000

2014-08-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69938987

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2009-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090403

2008-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938987 P 20080814

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041001

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI