Global Patent Index - EP 0951200 A3

EP 0951200 A3 2000-01-05 - Tubular loudspeaker enclosure

Title (en)

Tubular loudspeaker enclosure

Title (de)

Rohrförmige Lautsprechergehäuse

Title (fr)

Enceinte acoustique tubulaire

Publication

EP 0951200 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 98402631 A

Priority

FR 9713511 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770364A1] The loudspeaker case is based on an extruded metal or plastic column. The loudspeaker enclosure comprises an extruded rectangular section tube (4) having a length which is at least 5 times its cross-sectional measurement. The tube may be made of aluminium, steel or plastic and coated internally with visco-elastic material. The tube stands on a base (12) and has a cap (1), and includes a front panel with apertures to support speakers (8,9,10,11). The front wall of the extruded tube has holes to receive the speakers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2013.01); H04R 1/26 (2013.01); H04R 1/2857 (2013.01); H04R 1/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770364 A1 19990430; FR 2770364 B3 20000407; EP 0951200 A2 19991020; EP 0951200 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04R 1/24 A, 7H 04R 1/02 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI