Global Patent Index - EP 0951203 A3

EP 0951203 A3 2000-11-29 - Assembly with a baking oven and a cooking hob

Title (en)

Assembly with a baking oven and a cooking hob

Title (de)

Anordnung mit Backofen und Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Ensemble avec un four et une table de cuisson

Publication

EP 0951203 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107286 A

Priority

DE 19817197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951203A2] A radial fan (21) draws in fresh air through an opening (29) and it is directed over the induction heaters (17) and electronic control systems (19) to be exhausted through a front opening (33) in the hob base plate (11). A seal plate (43) separates the air from the oven top plate (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/12; F24C 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 6/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/1263 (2013.01); F24C 15/101 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951203 A2 19991020; EP 0951203 A3 20001129; EP 0951203 B1 20041006; DE 19817197 A1 19991021; DE 19817197 C2 20000706; ES 2230762 T3 20050501

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-29 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 59910688

2016-03-29 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 59910688

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59910688

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2014-08-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FAGORBRANDTSAS

- Effective date: 20050705

2009-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FAGORBRANDTSAS

2009-02-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FAGORBRANDTSAS

- Effective date: 20050705

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERATE G.M.B.H. *BSH

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-04-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2005-08-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20050705

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230762 T3

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910688 P 20041111

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR NL

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR NL

1999-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI