Global Patent Index - EP 0951429 B1

EP 0951429 B1 2001-12-19 - DISPENSING DEVICE WITH SAFE UNSCREWING

Title (en)

DISPENSING DEVICE WITH SAFE UNSCREWING

Title (de)

AUSGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT SICHERUNG GEGEN ABSCHRAUBEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION A SECURITE DE DEVISSAGE

Publication

EP 0951429 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98902038 A

Priority

  • FR 9800021 W
  • FR 9700187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2758311A1] The invention concerns a device for dispensing (1) a fluid product designed for being screwed on a threaded neck (2) of a fluid product reservoir, said device comprising a threaded fixing element (14) for being in threaded engagement with the threaded neck (2) of the reservoir for fixing the dispensing device on the reservoir neck. The invention is characterised in that a unidirectional driving member (15) is provided covering the fixing element so as to prevent any access to the fixing element (14) when it is screwed on the reservoir neck, and for driving the fixing element only in the direction ensuring its screwing on the reservoir neck, such that the fixing element cannot be unscrewed by rotation of the unidirectional driving member.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/02; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/022 (2013.01); B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B65D 2255/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2758311 A1 19980717; FR 2758311 B1 19990326; DE 69803036 D1 20020131; DE 69803036 T2 20020814; EP 0951429 A1 19991027; EP 0951429 B1 20011219; ES 2169495 T3 20020701; US 6367641 B1 20020409; WO 9830464 A1 19980716

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040108

2005-01-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050107

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040108

2004-01-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-01-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030128

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030104

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169495 T3

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803036 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT