Global Patent Index - EP 0951437 B1

EP 0951437 B1 2001-04-04 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PREPARING BOTTLES FOR FILLING, AND METHOD OF FILLING BOTTLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND MACHINE FOR PREPARING BOTTLES FOR FILLING, AND METHOD OF FILLING BOTTLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUM VORBEREITEN VON FLASCHEN FÜR EINE BEFÜLLUNG UND BEFÜLLEN DER FLASCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET MACHINE POUR PREPARER DES BOUTEILLES EN VUE D'UNE OPERATION DE REMPLISSAGE ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE DESDITES BOUTEILLES

Publication

EP 0951437 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98902978 A

Priority

  • DE 19700156 A
  • EP 9800028 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830491A1] The invention concerns a method and machine for preparing bottles (11), in particular PET bottles, which are moved forwards along a conveying path in order to be filled. The invention also concerns a method of filling the bottles with a drink-forming filling material, the bottles (11) being grouped successively in rows transversely to the conveying direction (6) with their openings directed upwards, and then being aligned at spacings and centred. The bottles (11) are then pivoted in transverse rows into an at least approximately vertical position with their openings directed downwards, and are jointly rinsed on the interior with a cleaning agent. In a first drying station the rinsed bottles (11) are then dried on the interior and, after passing through the first drying station, are channelled into a sterile region (17b). After entering said sterile region, the bottles (11) are sterilized on the interior with a sterilizing agent, residues of said sterilizing agent being expelled from the sterilized bottles (11) in a second drying station. When the bottles (11) are to be filled with CO2 and/or N2-containing filling material, they are subsequently wetted on the interior with sterile water and, after drying, are pivoted in a second turning process into a filling position in which their openings are directed upwards. The bottles (11) are then filled with the stipulated amount of filling material and sealed at least temporarily in a sealing station with a sealing part. Finally the sealed bottles (11) are channelled out of the sterile region (17b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/10 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01); B67C 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 7/0073 (2013.01); B65B 55/10 (2013.01); B67C 2003/2691 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830491 A1 19980716; AR 011063 A1 20000802; AT 200269 T 20010415; BR 9806850 A 20000314; DK 0951437 T3 20010813; EP 0951437 A1 19991027; EP 0951437 B1 20010404; ES 2158667 T3 20010901; GR 3036026 T3 20010928; JP 2001507659 A 20010612; PT 951437 E 20010928; US 6328928 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59800588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KHS CORPOPLAST GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59800588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110504

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040107

2005-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-11-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2004-11-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-11-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-10-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040801

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GEA FINNAH G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040106

2004-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-07 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-19 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-17 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-06 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158667

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800588

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200269

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000517

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990414

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE