Global Patent Index - EP 0951444 B9

EP 0951444 B9 2001-12-05 - SYNTHESIS OF LARGE CRYSTAL ZEOLITES

Title (en)

SYNTHESIS OF LARGE CRYSTAL ZEOLITES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GROSSEN ZEOLITHKRISTALLEN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE DE ZEOLITES A GROS CRISTAUX

Publication

EP 0951444 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 97946269 A

Priority

  • US 9718948 W
  • US 2883096 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9816469A1] Large crystal zeolites are prepared by heating a zeolite synthesis mixture under agitation to a temperature equal to or less than the effective nucleation temperature of the zeolite synthesis mixture and thereafter the zeolite synthesis mixture is heated without agitation to a temperature equal to or greater than the effective nucleation temperature of the zeolite synthesis mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 39/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 39/40 (2006.01); C01B 39/02 (2006.01); C01B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 39/02 (2013.01); C01B 39/04 (2013.01); Y10S 423/22 (2013.01); Y10S 423/29 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9816469 A1 19980423; AU 5147498 A 19980511; BR 9713485 A 20001031; CA 2268767 A1 19980423; CN 1105680 C 20030416; CN 1237947 A 19991208; DE 69705866 D1 20010830; DE 69705866 T2 20020411; EP 0951444 A1 19991027; EP 0951444 B1 20010725; EP 0951444 B9 20011205; JP 2001506215 A 20010515; JP 4455679 B2 20100421; KR 100484082 B1 20050420; KR 20000049241 A 20000725; TW 352379 B 19990211; US 5958366 A 19990928; ZA 9709264 B 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-05-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-12-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2004-10-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031017

2002-10-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69705866 20010830

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000825

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990512

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL