Global Patent Index - EP 0951454 B8

EP 0951454 B8 2002-11-20 - METHOD FOR FORMING AN INTERNALLY CHANNELED GLASS ARTICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FORMING AN INTERNALLY CHANNELED GLASS ARTICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES MIT INTERNEN KANÄLEN VERSEHENEN GLASKÖRPERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE DE VERRE A CANAUX INTERIEURS

Publication

EP 0951454 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 97946629 A

Priority

  • US 9720484 W
  • US 3087496 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821154A1] The present invention is directed to a method for forming glass articles containing enclosed channels. The method comprises the flollowing steps: a) delivering and depositing a first length of a molten glass ribbon (18) to a surface of a mold (20) having a modl cavity (22) possessing at least one channel-forming groove (22) and a peripheral surface, wherein the first length (18) overlies the mold cavity (22) and the peripheral surface; b) allowing the first length of the molten glass ribbon (18) to substantially conform to the contour of the mold cavity (22) resulting in the formation of at least one channel in the first length of the molten glass ribbon (18); c) delivering and depositing a second length of the molten glass ribbon (26) to the exposed surface of the first length of the molten glass ribbon (18). The delivered molten glass viscosity of the molten glass ribbon (18, 26) is such that the following is achieved: 1) the second length (26) bridges but does not sag into complete contact with the channel portion of the earlier-deposited first length (18); and, 2) a hermetic seal is formed wherever the molten glass' first (18) and second lengths (26) contact.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 13/14; C03B 9/12; C03B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 23/24 (2006.01); C03B 9/00 (2006.01); C03B 9/12 (2006.01); C03B 13/14 (2006.01); C03B 17/02 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 61/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 13/14 (2013.01); C03B 9/12 (2013.01); C03B 17/02 (2013.01); H01J 9/247 (2013.01); H01J 61/307 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821154 A1 19980522; DE 69715916 D1 20021031; DE 69715916 T2 20030807; EP 0951454 A1 19991027; EP 0951454 A4 20000301; EP 0951454 B1 20020925; EP 0951454 B8 20021120; JP 2001505521 A 20010424; JP 4237827 B2 20090311; KR 100490317 B1 20050517; KR 20000053245 A 20000825; US 6301932 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69715916

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051107

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051107

2004-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715916 20021031

2002-10-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-03-01 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03B 13/14 A, 7C 03B 9/12 B, 7C 03B 17/02 B

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL