Global Patent Index - EP 0951527 B1

EP 0951527 B1 2001-12-12 - OPERATING FLUID FOR LIFETIME LUBRICATED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

OPERATING FLUID FOR LIFETIME LUBRICATED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

FUNKTIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR LEBENSDAUERGESCHMIERTE VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

LIQUIDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE A GRAISSAGE A VIE

Publication

EP 0951527 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909299 A

Priority

  • DE 19647554 A
  • EP 9705166 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19647554A1] The invention relates to an operating fluid which can be efficiently used for lifetime lubrication and cooling of an internal combustion engine. As basic liquid, said fluid contains a polyalkylene glycol obtained from ethylen oxide and propylen oxide and an additive compound, consisting of a) 0.012 -1.0 wt.% of a reaction product from diphenylamine and 2.4.4.-trymethylpentene; b) 0.01-1.0 wt.% of a pentaerythrite partially or totally esterified with an alkyl-substituting p-hydroxy propionic acid; c) 0.01-1.0 wt.% of a mono- or di-(C4-C8)alkyl phosphoric acid-(C10-C15) alkylamide; d) 0.01-1.0 wt.% of the triphenylthiophosphate; e) 0.01-0.1 wt.% of a tolutriazole aminoethylized with a straight chain or branched alkyl group with 2-10 carbon atoms and/or f) 0.01-0.1 wt.% of the 1H-benzotriazole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 107/34 (2006.01); C10M 129/76 (2006.01); C10M 133/12 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01); C10M 137/02 (2006.01); C10M 137/10 (2006.01); C10M 159/12 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/045 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 129/76 (2013.01); C10M 133/44 (2013.01); C10M 137/105 (2013.01); C10M 137/16 (2013.01); C10M 159/12 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/047 (2013.01); C10M 2223/06 (2013.01); C10M 2223/061 (2013.01); C10M 2223/08 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2215/223 + C10M 2215/223

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708653 U1 19970821; DE 19647554 A1 19980528; EP 0951527 A1 19991027; EP 0951527 B1 20011212; JP 2002505693 A 20020219; KR 100304292 B1 20010913; KR 20000049187 A 20000725; US 6194359 B1 20010227; WO 9822559 A1 19980528

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705820

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-16 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705820 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010316

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BREMIN MINERALOEL GMBH & CO. KG

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT