Global Patent Index - EP 0951587 B1

EP 0951587 B1 2001-04-18 - MOBIUS ELECTROLYSIS

Title (en)

MOBIUS ELECTROLYSIS

Title (de)

MÖBIUSELEKTROLYSE

Title (fr)

ELECTROLYSE DE MÖBIUS

Publication

EP 0951587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942696 A

Priority

  • AT 9700212 W
  • AT 175196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814640A1] The invention relates to a silver refining installation according to the Möbius process. Said installation comprises tripping mother blanks (K) placed in an electrolysis tank between flat anodes (A) with anode bags and is characterized by the fact that the anodes in each case have at least one suction tube (15) to suction off anode slime from the anode bag during electrolysis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 7/00; C25C 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/20 (2006.01); C25C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 1/20 (2013.01); C25C 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FI GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814640 A1 19980409; AT 404739 B 19990225; AT A175196 A 19980615; AU 4444397 A 19980424; DE 59703405 D1 20010523; EP 0951587 A1 19991027; EP 0951587 B1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2006-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PRIOR ENGINEERING A.G.

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-07-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703405 20010523

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000928

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990406

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FI GB IT SE