Global Patent Index - EP 0951600 B1

EP 0951600 B1 2001-12-19 - SEPARATOR IN A MULTILAYER HEADBOX

Title (en)

SEPARATOR IN A MULTILAYER HEADBOX

Title (de)

TRENNELEMENT EINES MEHRSCHICHTENSTOFFAUFLAUFES

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR D'UNE ARRIVEE DE PATE MULTICOUCHE

Publication

EP 0951600 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97949853 A

Priority

  • DE 9702502 W
  • DE 19652983 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19652983A1] Disclosed is a multi-piece separator for a multilayer headbox of a paper machine, comprised of at least one first element upstream and a second element dowstream, both extending over the machine width. The invention is characterized in that both elements concerned are connected by means of a bayonet fastener.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19652983 A1 19970528; AT 211195 T 20020115; EP 0951600 A1 19991027; EP 0951600 B1 20011219; WO 9827270 A1 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-10-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051025

2004-10-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041008

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705926 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211195 T 20020115

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000714

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE