Global Patent Index - EP 0951629 B1

EP 0951629 B1 2002-09-25 - BURNER CONTROL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD

Title (en)

BURNER CONTROL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD

Title (de)

BRENNERREGELGERÄT UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT ET PROCEDE SERVANT A COMMANDER UN BRULEUR

Publication

EP 0951629 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933755 A

Priority

  • GB 9702010 W
  • GB 9700035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9829693A1] A burner control instrument for controlling at least some functions of a burner includes a display (2), switch means (11) for switching the display (2) on and off, and a sensor (8) for detecting proximity of a person to the display, the sensor being arranged to cause the switch means (11) to switch the display on in response to detecting the proximity of a person.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/26 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/265 (2013.01); F23N 1/02 (2013.01); F23N 2023/08 (2013.01); F23N 2031/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9829693 A1 19980709; CA 2275794 A1 19980709; DE 69715917 D1 20021031; EP 0951629 A1 19991027; EP 0951629 B1 20020925; GB 9700035 D0 19970219

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040728

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030723

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715917 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000810

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL