Global Patent Index - EP 0951860 B1

EP 0951860 B1 2002-09-25 - Dishwasher or washing machine provided with a member for checking the working of the flood-preventing device

Title (en)

Dishwasher or washing machine provided with a member for checking the working of the flood-preventing device

Title (de)

Spülmaschine oder Waschmaschine mit einem Element zur Überprüfung der Funktionsfähigkeit einer Vorrichtung zur Vorbeugung von Überflutungen

Title (fr)

Lave-vaiselle ou machine à laver avec un élément pour vérifier le fonctionnement d'un dispositif de prévention des inondations

Publication

EP 0951860 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830087 A

Priority

IT MI980526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951860A1] A dishwasher, washing machine or the like, including a flood-preventing device consisting of a bottom tray (1) suitable to collect the water leaking from any component of the machine, a float (2) in the tray (1) and a microswitch (6) which can be activated by the float (2) as soon as the water collected in the tray (1) causes the raising thereof, is also provided in the tray (1) with a hole which is water-tightly closed by a deformable diaphragm-shaped member (7) so that the float (2) can be raised by pushing upwards on said diaphragm (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4244 (2013.01); D06F 39/081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951860 A1 19991027; EP 0951860 B1 20020925; DE 69903087 D1 20021031; DE 69903087 T2 20030522; ES 2182474 T3 20030301; IT 1298747 B1 20000202; IT MI980526 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050218

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-02-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2005-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-02-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182474 T3

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903087 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI