Global Patent Index - EP 0951892 A3

EP 0951892 A3 2000-05-31 - Bed, particularly for communities, of the type with bed-plane articulated structure and means for the movement and control of at least said bed-plane

Title (en)

Bed, particularly for communities, of the type with bed-plane articulated structure and means for the movement and control of at least said bed-plane

Title (de)

Bett für Institutionen mit artikulierter Bettrahmenstruktur und Vorrichtung zur Bewegung und Steuerung der Bettrahmen

Title (fr)

Lit pour institutions avec structure de sommier articulé et dispositif pour le mouvement et le contrôle du sommier

Publication

EP 0951892 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98124735 A

Priority

IT TV980064 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951892A2] Bed for communities, of the type with bed-plane articulated structure and means for its movement and control, made up of a base provided with small wheels and relative common stop, from which, fulcrumed on the side, arms also of the electrically moved type protrude, as supports of a frame, made up of headboard and footboard complete with a blanket-holding projecting plane, to which frame an articulated bed-plane with foldable sides, and consisting of four elements, three of which are reclinable, by position adjustment electromechanical means, respectively made up a back element, a relax element hinged to the centre element fixed on the frame, and a foot element hinged to said relax element is associated, and also in which both in correspondence of the extrados of at least one side, and preferably of the extrados of a footboard, control boards for the also independent movement and the frame and the articulated bed-plane control are provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/002

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A61G 7/002 (2006.01); A61G 7/015 (2006.01); A61G 7/018 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/0507 (2013.01); A47C 19/045 (2013.01); A47C 20/041 (2013.01); A47C 20/08 (2013.01); A61G 7/002 (2013.01); A61G 7/015 (2013.01); A61G 7/0509 (2016.11); A61G 7/0514 (2016.11); A61G 7/018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951892 A2 19991027; EP 0951892 A3 20000531; IT TV980064 A1 19991022

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051213

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041221

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991231

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI