Global Patent Index - EP 0951926 B1

EP 0951926 B1 2004-12-01 - Touring,Telemark or cross-country binding

Title (en)

Touring,Telemark or cross-country binding

Title (de)

Touren-, Telemark- oder Langlauf-Skibindung

Title (fr)

Fixation de ski de randonnée, de ski de Telemark ou de ski de fond

Publication

EP 0951926 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102015 A

Priority

DE 19818517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951926A1] A ski binding has a support (14) for the leading end of the ski boot (11) at the ski, especially the leading end of the boot sole, from above and at the sides through a holder (39). The leading end of the boot is secured in place, and the boot heel (13) can be lifted clear. The housing of the holder, at the ski or binding, has a clamp behind the metatarsus (17), especially in or shortly in front of the arch of the foot, especially as a tensioning cable, clamping strip or clamping plate (39), etc..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00; A63C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01); A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2013.01); A63C 9/20 (2013.01); A63C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951926 A1 19991027; EP 0951926 B1 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911160 P 20050105

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030114

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI