Global Patent Index - EP 0951955 A3

EP 0951955 A3 2001-01-24 - Method and device for the manufacture of reinforcements

Title (en)

Method and device for the manufacture of reinforcements

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bewehrungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d'armatures

Publication

EP 0951955 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107818 A

Priority

  • DE 19817744 A
  • DE 19830414 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951955A2] The device has a conveyor unit for the transporting of pallets (11) longitudinally and transversely to its longitudinal direction, and a delivery station (12) for delivering to the pallets aligned and cut to length reinforcement sections corresponding to the shape of the precast concrete parts to be produced. The delivery station has a fixed section (13) and a rotatable section (14), or an arc-shaped conveyor unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819262 U1 19990121; EP 0951955 A2 19991027; EP 0951955 A3 20010124

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE FR IT NL

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR IT NL

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI