Global Patent Index - EP 0951956 B1

EP 0951956 B1 2000-06-28 - Method and apparatus for casting articles in sand moulds

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for casting articles in sand moulds

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Giessen in Sandformen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour coulée dans les moules en sable

Publication

EP 0951956 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98107607 A

Priority

EP 98107607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951956A1] In a method of casting articles in cavities (not shown) in a sand mould (1), using a supply unit (4) for introducing molten metal (not shown) into said cavities through a runner (2), the main novel feature is the use of a resilient sealing element, in the example shown a ring (8), preferably made of heat-insulating material, to provide a liquid-tight seal around the connection between a mouthpiece (3) on said unit (4) and said runner (2), when the unit (4) is moved into the filling position shown. The use of the sealing ring (8) makes it possible to avoid contamination of the mouthpiece (3) by sand from the mould, as well as solidification of molten metal on the mouthpiece, that would otherwise disturb the latter's correct co-operation with the next mould in succession to be filled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 11/10; B22C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 11/10 (2006.01); B22C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 11/10 (2013.01); B22C 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951956 A1 19991027; EP 0951956 B1 20000628; AU 3138899 A 19991116; DE 69800190 D1 20000803; DE 69800190 T2 20001123; DK 0951956 T3 20001106; ES 2150296 T3 20001116; WO 9955477 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040428

2005-04-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040427

2003-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030409

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030405

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-02-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150296 T3

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800190 20000803

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1999-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981211

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI