Global Patent Index - EP 0951990 A3

EP 0951990 A3 2000-05-03 - Method for manufacturing self supporting containers made of paper like material

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing self supporting containers made of paper like material

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines selbsttragenden Behälters von einem papierähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'un récipient autoportant d'un matériau du type papier

Publication

EP 0951990 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107340 A

Priority

IT TO980346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951990A2] The method comprises in succession the following operating steps: -- the cutting, by means of a die-cutter (21), of a disk (D) from a ribbon (11) of paperlike material which is fed continuously from a storage reel (10); -- the drawing of said disk by means of complementarily shaped mold parts (22-23) and the forming of the bottom and of the lateral wall or walls of the container, the lateral wall or walls having a perimetric flap which is in excess with respect to the depth of the finished container (30); -- the swaging, by means of a beading ring (24), of the excess perimetric flap and the forming of a compacted circular rim (B) which is adapted to give the container (30) self-standing characteristics. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 43/00; B31F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/0077 (2013.01); B31B 2201/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951990 A2 19991027; EP 0951990 A3 20000503; IT TO980346 A1 19991025

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR IT

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 43/00 A, 7B 31F 1/00 B

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI