Global Patent Index - EP 0951993 B1

EP 0951993 B1 2002-09-04 - Register-true drive for a printing cylinder or for a cut-off register roller of a rotary press

Title (en)

Register-true drive for a printing cylinder or for a cut-off register roller of a rotary press

Title (de)

Registerhaltiger Antrieb eines Druckzylinders oder einer Schnittregisterwalze einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement en parfait repérage pour un cylindre d'impression ou pour un rouleau de registre de coupe d'une machine rotative

Publication

EP 0951993 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108003 A

Priority

DE 19818026 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0951993A1] The indexing drive process is for a drive for a cylinder (D1-D4) or an indexing roll (20) of a rotary printing press (DT). A change in the longitudinal expansion (e1,e2) of a sector of the print material course (B) is reported in the form of measurements (V1,V2,S1,S2) and is compensated by indexing setting of the cylinder and/or the indexing roll. An Independent claim is also included for a method for controlling the indexing drive of a rotary printing press.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/02; B65H 23/032; B65H 23/188

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/12 (2006.01); B65H 23/02 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/02 (2013.01); B41F 13/025 (2013.01); B41F 13/12 (2013.01); B65H 23/1882 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0951993 A1 19991027; EP 0951993 B1 20020904; DE 19918399 A1 19991104; DE 19918399 B4 20080807

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902522

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902522

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100422

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100422

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100720

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080423

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080422

2008-12-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-20 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902522 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REGISTER-TRUE DRIVE FOR A PRINTING CYLINDER OR FOR A CUT-OFF REGISTER ROLLER OF A ROTARY PRESS

2000-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000114

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI