Global Patent Index - EP 0952006 A3

EP 0952006 A3 2000-07-26 - Method of fabricating printed letters, envelopes, device for fabricating envelopes as well as method of fabricating envelopes

Title (en)

Method of fabricating printed letters, envelopes, device for fabricating envelopes as well as method of fabricating envelopes

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Drucksendungen, Umhüllung, Einrichtung zur Herstellung der Umhüllung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung der Umhüllung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la fabrication des lettres, enveloppes, dispositif pour la fabrication d'enveloppes, ainsi que la méthode pour la fabrication d'enveloppes

Publication

EP 0952006 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107700 A

Priority

  • DE 19817878 A
  • DE 19841549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952006A2] The method involves printing on a side of a sheet of paper, plastic, etc. and sending it in the closed state, whereby the printed data is produced by an instruction generator (1-3) and transmitted over a network to a printer in which the printed data are printed onto the sheet. The instruction generator transfers the print data to a production station (5-10) suitable for performing the print application that produces the printed message in a form suitable for dispatch. Independent claims are also included for an envelope, an arrangement for producing envelopes and a method of producing envelopes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/08; B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/08 (2006.01); B31B 41/00 (2006.01); B43M 5/04 (2006.01); G06F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2013.01); B31B 2150/00 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); B31B 2170/20 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4033807 A 19770705 - NEILL JIMMIE, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952006 A2 19991027; EP 0952006 A3 20000726; JP 2000103194 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041220

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 42D 15/08 A, 7B 43M 5/04 B

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI