Global Patent Index - EP 0952079 A3

EP 0952079 A3 2001-01-03 - Cable ferry

Title (en)

Cable ferry

Title (de)

Seilfähre

Title (fr)

Transbordeur à câble

Publication

EP 0952079 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107694 A

Priority

  • DE 19818639 A
  • DE 19855086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952079A2] The arrangement has a ferry vehicle (1) and a cable connection between the bank regions. A circulating traction cable (6) is arranged essentially in the base area of the watercourse and driven by winches on the banks. The traction cable is connected to the hull of the unpowered vehicle via pivotable cantilever arms (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/54; B63H 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/56 (2006.01); B63B 35/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/54 (2013.01); B63B 21/56 (2013.01); B63B 2021/566 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952079 A2 19991027; EP 0952079 A3 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027073

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI