Global Patent Index - EP 0952265 A3

EP 0952265 A3 2000-07-26 - Column mounting plate for the mounting of a concrete pole on a support

Title (en)

Column mounting plate for the mounting of a concrete pole on a support

Title (de)

Stützenschuh zur Befestigung eines Betonpfahles auf einer Unterlage

Title (fr)

Sabot de colonne pour le montage d'un pieu en béton sur un support

Publication

EP 0952265 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99107059 A

Priority

DE 19817832 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952265A2] The anchoring members (31,32,41,42) can be accommodated by the concrete post. By means of the housing (20), the baseplate (10) is divisible into several sections (11,12,13), whereby in the area of one section (11) the housing has a base (25). In the area of this base at least one anchoring member can be accommodated by the housing. The at least two sections of the base plate formed by the housing have at least one rear anchoring member (41,42). <??>The housing in plan-view is Y-shaped. Under the housing base (25) the bolt hole is arranged in the baseplate (10). The housing consists of two plates, running parallel to each other in the area of the rib. The anchoring members are concrete bars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/21; E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/21 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/215 (2013.01); E04H 12/2261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 19514685 A1 19951116 - TERAESPEIKKO OY [FI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952265 A2 19991027; EP 0952265 A3 20000726; EP 0952265 B1 20030813; AT 247199 T 20030815; DE 19817832 A1 19991028; DK 0952265 T3 20031124; ES 2200434 T3 20040301

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170412

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140410

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140410

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140410

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140410

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247199 T

- Effective date: 20140410

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140430

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120419

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906560

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE

2012-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906560

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PEIKKO GMBH

- Free text: PEIKKO GMBH#ALRAFTERSTRASSE 11#34513 WALDECK (DE) -TRANSFER TO- PEIKKO GMBH#ALRAFTERSTRASSE 11#34513 WALDECK (DE)

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200434 T3

2003-11-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906560 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/21 A, 7E 04H 12/22 B

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI