Global Patent Index - EP 0952271 A3

EP 0952271 A3 2000-12-20 - Wood-concrete composite element

Title (en)

Wood-concrete composite element

Title (de)

Holz-Beton-Verbundelement

Title (fr)

Elément à structure mixte bois-béton

Publication

EP 0952271 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108066 A

Priority

DE 19818525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952271A2] Several ribs (5) are inserted between the boards (4) in the wooden structural part (2) and extend over the total length of the boards (4) into the concrete part (3). Above the compound surface (7) are recesses (11,12,14,15). A number of cross force anchors (10) run crossways to the longitudinal direction of the compound ribs in the recesses and are enclosed by the concrete part. The cross force anchors and the connecting ribs form a union which can accommodate the forces acting vertically to the plane of the board stack component. The cross force anchors are metallic flat profiles (10a), angle profiles (10c,10d) or round bars (10b,10f), arranged in grooves (11) of the connecting ribs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/29; E04B 5/02; E04B 5/38; E04C 2/12; E04C 2/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2006.01); E04B 5/38 (2006.01); E04C 2/26 (2006.01); E04C 3/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E04B 5/38 (2013.01); E04C 2/26 (2013.01); E04C 3/29 (2013.01); E04B 2005/237 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952271 A2 19991027; EP 0952271 A3 20001220; DE 19818525 A1 19991111; DE 19818525 B4 20041125

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040620

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FI LI SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 3/29 A, 7E 04C 2/26 B, 7E 04B 5/38 B, 7E 04C 2/12 B, 7E 04B 5/02 B

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI LI SE

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI