Global Patent Index - EP 0952352 A3

EP 0952352 A3 2001-05-30 - Thrust-balancing device

Title (en)

Thrust-balancing device

Title (de)

Achsschubausgleich

Title (fr)

Equilibrage de poussée axiale

Publication

EP 0952352 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99107770 A

Priority

JP 10972098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952352A2] A flow channel and pressure equalizing sections introduce a fluid having substantially no angular momentum into a thrust balance chamber of a thrust balance device. The introduction of this fluid reduces the angular momentum of the fluid in the thrust balance chamber, facilitating the discharge of fluid out of the thrust balance chamber through a variable orifice. The thrust balance chamber exerts a variable pressure onto a rear surface of an impeller of a centrifugal pump. This pressure prevents significant displacement of the impeller during pump operation. The result is a centrifugal pump having good thrust balance properties regardless of flow rate and impeller speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/04 (2006.01); F04D 29/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/2266 (2013.01); F04D 29/0416 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952352 A2 19991027; EP 0952352 A3 20010530; EP 0952352 B1 20041222; CN 1120937 C 20030910; CN 1232928 A 19991027; DE 69922729 D1 20050127; DE 69922729 T2 20051201; KR 100295011 B1 20010712; KR 19990083231 A 19991125; TW 406166 B 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180404

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922729 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030811

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI