Global Patent Index - EP 0952387 A3

EP 0952387 A3 2001-05-23 - Illumination system comprising low voltage lights and lamps

Title (en)

Illumination system comprising low voltage lights and lamps

Title (de)

Beleuchtungssystem mit Niederspannungs-Leuchten und Lampen

Title (fr)

Système d' éclairage avec feux et lampes à basse tension

Publication

EP 0952387 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108101 A

Priority

DE 19818403 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0952387A2] The system has low voltage lights and lamps supplied with electrical energy from a common power supply stage, e.g. an accumulator (1). The lights and (5-10) lamps have light source power LEDs in combinable form. The LEDs are colour combinable and have an inner construction enabling the radiation of light of different wavelengths, e.g. with a multilayer construction with separate drives for the individual layers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21K 7/00; B63B 45/00; F21S 1/14; H01L 25/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 45/04 (2006.01); F21S 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 45/04 (2013.01); F21S 9/02 (2013.01); B63B 2045/005 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0952387 A2 19991027; EP 0952387 A3 20010523; DE 19818403 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011101

2002-03-06 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: SCHULZE HORN, HANNES DR.-ING.

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHULZE HORN, HANNES DR.-ING.

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21K 7/00 A, 7F 21S 1/14 B, 7H 01L 25/075 B, 7B 63B 45/00 B

1999-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

1999-10-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI